HI HR96 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR96

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to PVM/TIA, JUD, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The United States To Endorse The Treaty On The Prohibition Of Nuclear Weapons To Support United Nations' Sustainable Development Goal 16 Calling For Peace, Justice, And Strong Institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The United States To Endorse The Treaty On The Prohibition Of Nuclear Weapons To Support United Nations' Sustainable Development Goal 16 Calling For Peace, Justice, And Strong Institutions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseReferred to PVM/TIA, JUD, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered
2020-03-05HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR115 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to PVM/TIA, JUD, referral sheet 40
HR96 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback