HI HR94 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR94
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Disability And Communication Access Board, In Collaboration With The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services, To Convene A Working Group On Accessible Government Documents.
Title
Requesting The Disability And Communication Access Board, In Collaboration With The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services, To Convene A Working Group On Accessible Government Documents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR113 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 40
HR94 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR94 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Deaf and Blind Task Force
Disability and Communication Access Board
Office of Enterprise Technology Services
Working Group
Disability and Communication Access Board
Office of Enterprise Technology Services
Working Group
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=94&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR94_.HTM |