HI HR87 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR87

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Designate The Reef Runway As The Frank T. Okimoto Reef Runway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Designate The Reef Runway As The Frank T. Okimoto Reef Runway.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered
2020-03-05HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR106 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
HR87 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback