HI HR87 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety To Form A Working Group To Examine Smarter Sentencing To Improve The Quality And Reliability Of State Criminal Sentencing Practices.
Title
Public Safety; Smarter Sentencing Working Group; Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1451) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1262) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, C. Lee, Woodson. |
2015-03-20 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR146 (Same As) 2015-04-22 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.