HI HR85 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR85
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Planning, In Collaboration With Various Agencies, To Develop A Plan To Establish A State Geological Survey In Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Planning, In Collaboration With Various Agencies, To Develop A Plan To Establish A State Geological Survey In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1595) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2021-03-29 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2021-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-23-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
2021-03-11 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR85 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR102 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR102 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
DLNR
DOT
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency
LRB
Office of Planning
State Geological Survey
University of Hawaii
DOT
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency
LRB
Office of Planning
State Geological Survey
University of Hawaii