HI HR83 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR83

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Education To Expand Access To The We The People Program For Public School Students And Report To The Legislature On The Implementation Of The C3 Framework For Social Studies In Public Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Education To Expand Access To The We The People Program For Public School Students And Report To The Legislature On The Implementation Of The C3 Framework For Social Studies In Public Schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered
2020-03-05HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR102 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40
HR83 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback