HI HR8 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Assist The State In Negotiating With The Federal Government For The Acquisition Of The Federal Detention Center, Honolulu.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Detention Center, Honolulu; Hawaii Congressional Delegation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2016-04-07HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
2016-04-07HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1573-16), recommending adoption.
2016-04-05HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Jordan.
2016-04-05HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2016-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308.
2016-02-18HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
2016-02-18HouseReported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 477-16), recommending referral to FIN.
2016-02-11HouseThe committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakashima; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
2016-02-05HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-11-16 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2016-02-04HouseReferred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 9
2016-02-04HouseOffered
2016-02-03HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR31 (Same As) 2016-04-08 - Referred to PSM, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback