HI HR8 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Governor And The Legislature Of The State Of Hawaii To Preserve The Counties' Share Of The Transient Accommodations Tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kauai County Package; Transient Accommodations Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
2013-03-22HouseReported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1224), recommending referral to FIN.
2013-03-18HouseThe committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-12HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 03-18-13 9:35AM in conference room 312.
2013-02-01HouseReferred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 12
2013-01-18HouseOffered
2013-01-18HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR7 (Same As) 2013-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback