HI HR8 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Provision Of Orientation And Additional Training To Increase The Ability Of State Agency Case Workers To Address The Issues Faced By Grandparents Raising Grandchildren.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing Additional Training to DHS Workers in Relation to GRG

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-26 (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused.
2010-02-26 (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 457-10), recommending referral to FIN.
2010-02-08 (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Shimabukuro, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Nishimoto.
2010-02-04 (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-08-10 9:00am in conference room 329.
2010-01-29 (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 11
2010-01-28 (H) Offered
2010-01-20 (H) To be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR14 (Same As) 2010-02-26 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback