HI HR78 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Maui County To Immediately Ban Predatory Cosmetics Stores From Doing Business In Lahaina.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Maui County To Immediately Ban Predatory Cosmetics Stores From Doing Business In Lahaina.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2032), recommending adoption.
2019-04-02HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Har, Onishi.
2019-03-29HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong, C. Lee excused (3).
2019-03-27HouseDeferred one day 03-28-19.
2019-03-27HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1759) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-20-19 10:15AM in conference room 309.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered
2019-03-07HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR80 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback