HI HR73 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR73

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Counties To Expedite The Issuance Of Gold Star Affixed Driver's Licenses To Those Residents Who Have Non-expired Hawaii-issued Driver's Licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Counties To Expedite The Issuance Of Gold Star Affixed Driver's Licenses To Those Residents Who Have Non-expired Hawaii-issued Driver's Licenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-05HouseOffered
2020-03-04HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR92 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
HR73 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback