HI HR70 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR70
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Examine The Feasibility And Economic Impact Of Creating A Health Policy Institute At The University Of Hawaii At Manoa.
Title
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Examine The Feasibility And Economic Impact Of Creating A Health Policy Institute At The University Of Hawaii At Manoa.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE/HLT on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to LHE/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-04 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR89 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 309.
HR70 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to PVM/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR70 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to PVM/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=70&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR70_.HTM |