HI HR70 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR70
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Elections To Convene A Task Force On Automatic Voter Registration.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Elections To Convene A Task Force On Automatic Voter Registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1457) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
2017-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR70 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR116 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR116 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).