HI HR70 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Find A Short-term Solution To Provide Parking And Security Personnel For The Maunawili Falls Trailhead.
Title
Parking and Security for the Maunawili Falls Trailhead
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1445-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1332-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-21 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-03-18 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-21-14 10:05AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-17-14 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
2014-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR96 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - Referred to WTL, WAM.