HI HR69 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR69

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands, Department Of Transportation Highways Division, And Hawaii County To Collectively Develop A Plan To Improve Mealani Road And Establish A Protocol To Use Mealani Road As An Emergency Bypass Route When Mamalahoa Highway Is Inaccessible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands, Department Of Transportation Highways Division, And Hawaii County To Collectively Develop A Plan To Improve Mealani Road And Establish A Protocol To Use Mealani Road As An Emergency Bypass Route When Mamalahoa Highway Is Inaccessible.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseRe-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 45
2020-03-11HouseReferred to TRN/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-05HouseOffered
2020-03-04HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR88 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 45
HR69 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback