HI HR67 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting That The State Include A Four Hundred Fifty-bed, Minimum-security Housing Facility In Its Design And Plans For The Proposed Oahu Community Correctional Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting That The State Include A Four Hundred Fifty-bed, Minimum-security Housing Facility In Its Design And Plans For The Proposed Oahu Community Correctional Center.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from PVM/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1834), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Lowen, McKelvey, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, Say, Yamane.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Kong; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott.
2019-03-20HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PVM/JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:05PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to PVM/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered
2019-03-07HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR67 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback