HI HR66 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR66
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Judiciary To Study The Feasibility Of Opening Community Outreach Courts In Puna And Kau.
Title
Requesting The Judiciary To Study The Feasibility Of Opening Community Outreach Courts In Puna And Kau.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1764-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, McKelvey, Mizuno, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (9). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1519-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa, McDermott. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-18 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR81 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to JDC.
HR66 (Carry Over) 2017-03-17 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 325.
HR66 (Carry Over) 2017-03-17 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=66&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR66_.HTM |