HI HR65 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR65

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Education To Explore The Feasibility Of Negotiating The Transfer Of Land Parcel 81002087000 For The Future Expansion Of Ke Kula o ehunuikaimalino Charter School.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Education To Explore The Feasibility Of Negotiating The Transfer Of Land Parcel 81002087000 For The Future Expansion Of Ke Kula o ehunuikaimalino Charter School.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseReferred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-05HouseOffered
2020-03-04HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR82 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
HR65 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback