HI HR64 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR64
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Superintendent Of Education To Request The Board Of Education To Honor Mckinley High School's 132 Fallen Soldiers By Safeguarding And Preserving The Name Of Mckinley High School.
Title
Urging The Superintendent Of Education To Request The Board Of Education To Honor Mckinley High School's 132 Fallen Soldiers By Safeguarding And Preserving The Name Of Mckinley High School.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR71 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR64 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR64 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=64&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HR64_.HTM |