HI HR64 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Office Of The Auditor To Conduct A Study On Whether The Scope Of Persons Authorized To Work As Insurance Appraisers And Insurance Umpires In The State Needs To Be Regulated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Office Of The Auditor To Conduct A Study On Whether The Scope Of Persons Authorized To Work As Insurance Appraisers And Insurance Umpires In The State Needs To Be Regulated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseThe committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-29HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 04-02-19 11:30AM in House conference room 430.
2019-03-28HouseRe-referred to IAC, referral sheet 44
2019-03-14HouseReferred to IAC/CPC, LMG, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered
2019-03-07HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR63 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback