HI HR61 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Harbors Division Of The Department Of Transportation To Convene A Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of Establishing A Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Harbors Division Of The Department Of Transportation To Convene A Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of Establishing A Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2020), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1824), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered
2019-03-07HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR60 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback