HI HR59 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR59

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Public Utilities Commission To Expand Access To Community-based Renewable Energy And Attract Communitybased Renewable Energy Developers By Expanding The Community-based Renewable Energy Program, Removing Or Increasing Caps On Capacity, And Ensuring That The Program Accommodates A Variety Of Projects, Models, And Sizes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Public Utilities Commission To Expand Access To Community-based Renewable Energy And Attract Communitybased Renewable Energy Developers By Expanding The Community-based Renewable Energy Program, Removing Or Increasing Caps On Capacity, And Ensuring That The Program Accommodates A Variety Of Projects, Models, And Sizes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-10HouseReferred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 39
2020-03-05HouseOffered
2020-03-03HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR59 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback