HI HR59 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR59
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Public Utilities Commission To Expand Access To Community-based Renewable Energy And Attract Communitybased Renewable Energy Developers By Expanding The Community-based Renewable Energy Program, Removing Or Increasing Caps On Capacity, And Ensuring That The Program Accommodates A Variety Of Projects, Models, And Sizes.
Title
Urging The Public Utilities Commission To Expand Access To Community-based Renewable Energy And Attract Communitybased Renewable Energy Developers By Expanding The Community-based Renewable Energy Program, Removing Or Increasing Caps On Capacity, And Ensuring That The Program Accommodates A Variety Of Projects, Models, And Sizes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 39 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-03 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR59 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=59&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR59_.HTM |