HI HR56 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Maui County To Take All Actions Necessary To Investigate And Address An Increase In Suspected Illicit Activity In North Kihei.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Maui County To Take All Actions Necessary To Investigate And Address An Increase In Suspected Illicit Activity In North Kihei.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2061), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2019-04-01HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753), recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:00AM in conference room 430.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered
2019-03-07HouseTo be offered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback