HI HR50 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR50
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Study And Assess The Impact Of Medical Bill Review Costs On The State's Workers' Compensation System.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Study And Assess The Impact Of Medical Bill Review Costs On The State's Workers' Compensation System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6). |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1720), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2019-03-15 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:35AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-07 | House | Offered |
2019-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR50 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
HCR49 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
HCR49 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=50&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR50_.HTM |