HI HR5 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR5

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH/HLT, JUD, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Human Services, In Collaboration With The Department Of Health, To Convene A Task Force To Establish Safe And Effective Discipline For All Children In Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Human Services, In Collaboration With The Department Of Health, To Convene A Task Force To Establish Safe And Effective Discipline For All Children In Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to HSH/HLT, JUD, referral sheet 39
2020-01-21HouseOffered
2020-01-17HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR7 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH/HLT, JUD, referral sheet 39
HR5 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Filed.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback