HI HR38 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Protect Public Health By Updating Its Rules Regarding Tuberculosis.
Title
Tuberculosis; Absences from the State; School Attendance
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-28-16 2:16PM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-24 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-28-16 in conference room 329. |
2016-03-23 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-24-16 10:15AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-24-16 10:15AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-22 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-18 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-18 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-21-16 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 03-21-16 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-16 at 10:00 AM in room 329. |
2016-03-16 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-18-16 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-14 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-16-16 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-11 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2016-03-10 | House | Offered |
2016-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR76 (Same As) 2016-03-28 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=38&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HR38_.HTM |