HI HR35 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR35

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting Disclosure Of Potential Lack Of Title Insurance To Purchasers Of Certain Real Property And Creation Of A Task Force On Title Insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting Disclosure Of Potential Lack Of Title Insurance To Purchasers Of Certain Real Property And Creation Of A Task Force On Title Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-27HouseOffered
2020-02-19HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR50 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39
HR35 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback