HI HR31 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR31

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau, In Consultation With The Department Of The Attorney General, To Conduct A Study Relating To The Reporting Requirements Of Section 353c-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau, In Consultation With The Department Of The Attorney General, To Conduct A Study Relating To The Reporting Requirements Of Section 353c-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseThe committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-03-11HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 03-13-20 10:00AM in conference room 430.
2020-03-10HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 39
2020-02-19HouseOffered
2020-02-18HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR46 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Re-referred to PVM, referral sheet 45
HR31 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Re-referred to LMG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 34

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback