HI HR31 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Re-referred to LMG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 34
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The State Capitol Management Committee To Take Steps Necessary To Name The Hawaii State Capitol "the Daniel Kahikina Akaka Hawaii State Capitol".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The State Capitol Management Committee To Take Steps Necessary To Name The Hawaii State Capitol "the Daniel Kahikina Akaka Hawaii State Capitol".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseRe-referred to LMG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 34
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LMG/WLH, referral sheet 27
2019-02-28HouseOffered
2019-02-25HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR26 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Re-referred to LMG, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 34

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback