HI HR30 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR30

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Human Services To Conduct A Study On The Reimplementation Of Adult Dental Benefits For Hawaii Residents Who Are Medicaid Enrollees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Human Services To Conduct A Study On The Reimplementation Of Adult Dental Benefits For Hawaii Residents Who Are Medicaid Enrollees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-18HouseOffered
2020-02-14HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR45 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39
HR30 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback