HI HR28 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Strongly Urging The United States Military To Clean Up Munitions And Explosives Of Concern In Hawaii Under The Military Munitions Response Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strongly Urging The United States Military To Clean Up Munitions And Explosives Of Concern In Hawaii Under The Military Munitions Response Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2021-03-31HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2).
2021-03-31HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1603), recommending adoption.
2021-03-29HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Nakamura.
2021-03-25HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-24HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-24HouseReported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1237), recommending referral to JHA.
2021-03-19HouseThe committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-03-16HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 03-19-21 9:00AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 15
2021-02-11HouseOffered
2021-02-10HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR35 (Same As) 2021-04-16 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 796) in amended form (SD 1).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback