HI HR28 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Health To Work With The Hawaii Restaurant Association To Establish Industry Standards To Address Certain Unsanitary Food Handling Conditions In Food Establishments And Adopt Rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Health To Work With The Hawaii Restaurant Association To Establish Industry Standards To Address Certain Unsanitary Food Handling Conditions In Food Establishments And Adopt Rules.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-21-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27
2019-02-28HouseOffered
2019-02-22HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR23 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback