HI HR22 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no and Herkes, McKelvey, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no and Herkes, McKelvey, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Report To The Legislature Information On Annual Injuries And Deaths Associated With All-terrain Vehicle.
Title
ATV injuries; report
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. George Fontaine [R] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Rep. Barbara Marumoto [R] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no and Herkes, McKelvey, Takumi excused. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1243), recommending referral to HLT. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Saiki. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-23-11 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Referred to TRN, HLT, referral sheet 5 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2011-01-27 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR19 (Same As) 2011-03-31 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no and Herkes, McKelvey, Takumi excused.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=22 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR22_.HTM |