HI HR2 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR2
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Department Of Energy And United States Navy To Renew Funding For The Kaneohe Wave Energy Test Site.
Title
Urging The United States Department Of Energy And United States Navy To Renew Funding For The Kaneohe Wave Energy Test Site.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-01-16 | House | Offered |
2020-01-15 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR3 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
HR2 (Carry Over) 2019-01-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR2 (Carry Over) 2019-01-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=2&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR2_.HTM |