HI HR199 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Convening A Digital Gaming Advisory Group To Assess And Monitor Gambling And Predatory Practices In The Digital Gaming Industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convening A Digital Gaming Advisory Group To Assess And Monitor Gambling And Predatory Practices In The Digital Gaming Industry.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2059) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2019-04-03HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR224 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback