HI HR187 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The President Of The United States And The United States Congress To Mitigate The Disproportionate Adverse Effects Of The Tax Cuts And Jobs Act Of 2017 On Hawaii Citizens By Increasing Federal Support Of Hawaii Housing Initiatives.
Title
Urging The President Of The United States And The United States Congress To Mitigate The Disproportionate Adverse Effects Of The Tax Cuts And Jobs Act Of 2017 On Hawaii Citizens By Increasing Federal Support Of Hawaii Housing Initiatives.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1797-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1630-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-22-18 11:20AM in conference room 423. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR217 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to HOU/PSM.