HI HR184 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR184
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services, In Consultation With The Department Of Public Safety, To Work With The Family Reunification Working Group And Other Community Stakeholders To Develop A Plan To Establish Visitation Centers At All State Correctional Facilities And Jails.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services, In Consultation With The Department Of Public Safety, To Work With The Family Reunification Working Group And Other Community Stakeholders To Develop A Plan To Establish Visitation Centers At All State Correctional Facilities And Jails.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from HSH/PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1886), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH/PVM on Friday, 03-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HSH/PVM, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR184 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR205 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR205 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=184&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR184_.HTM |