HI HR18 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR18

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-6)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting That The Wall Street Journal Include Hawaiian Airlines In The Newspaper's Future Rankings Of The Best And Worst Airlines In The United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting That The Wall Street Journal Include Hawaiian Airlines In The Newspaper's Future Rankings Of The Best And Worst Airlines In The United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-14 - House - House Tourism & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2020-02-27HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1).
2020-02-27HouseReported from TRN/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796-20), recommending adoption.
2020-02-14HouseThe committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2020-02-14HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2020-02-11HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by TRN/TIA on Friday, 02-14-20 11:15AM in conference room 423.
2020-01-31HouseReferred to TRN/TIA, referral sheet 10
2020-01-31HouseOffered
2020-01-31HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR34 (Same As) 2020-02-28 - Referred to EET/TRS.
HR18 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback