HI HR18 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing September 2010 As Education Awareness And Appreciation Month In Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Awareness and Appreciation Month

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-17 (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
2010-02-12 (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-17-10 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2010-02-04 (H) Referred to EDN, referral sheet 17
2010-02-03 (H) Offered
2010-02-02 (H) To be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR58 (Same As) 2010-02-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback