HI HR179 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR179

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Promoting A "green Christmas" By Encouraging The Public To Select Plantable Native Trees For Holiday Celebrations To Help Address The Climate Crisis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting A "green Christmas" By Encouraging The Public To Select Plantable Native Trees For Holiday Celebrations To Help Address The Climate Crisis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-11HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR198 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
HR179 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback