HI HR174 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Follow-up Study To Its 2015 Study Of Departmental Engineering Sections That Manage Capital Improvement Projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Follow-up Study To Its 2015 Study Of Departmental Engineering Sections That Manage Capital Improvement Projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2026), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1765), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Thursday, 03-21-19 3:05PM in conference room 312.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR193 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback