HI HR162 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Establish A Task Force To Conduct A Study Concerning The Current And Future Needs Of The State Archives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Establish A Task Force To Conduct A Study Concerning The Current And Future Needs Of The State Archives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1763), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Thursday, 03-21-19 3:05PM in conference room 312.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR180 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback