HI HR158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Education To Include Mental Health Education For Students In Its Curriculum And Suicide Prevention As Part Of The In-service Training Of Teachers And Principals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Education To Include Mental Health Education For Students In Its Curriculum And Suicide Prevention As Part Of The In-service Training Of Teachers And Principals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1874), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Ward.
2019-03-22HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2019-03-19HouseRe-referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 37
2019-03-14HouseReferred to LHE/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback