HI HR154 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR154

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Remove Abandoned Vehicles, Garbage, And Marine Debris From Public Parks And Beaches In The State Within Ten Business Days Of The Date That The Abandoned Vehicle, Garbage, Or Marine Debris Was Reported To The Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Remove Abandoned Vehicles, Garbage, And Marine Debris From Public Parks And Beaches In The State Within Ten Business Days Of The Date That The Abandoned Vehicle, Garbage, Or Marine Debris Was Reported To The Department.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2018-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5).
2018-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1801-18), recommending adoption.
2018-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308.
2018-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-03-28HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1602-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2018-03-23HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee, Lowen.
2018-03-20HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2018-03-13HouseReferred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
2018-03-09HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR183 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to WTL.
HR154 (Carry Over) 2017-03-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback