HI HR151 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting An Update Of The Hawaii Energy Forum's Report On Liquefied Natural Gas Options For The State.
Title
Liquefied Natural Gas; Report
Sponsors
Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1). | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1788-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Chang, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Herkes. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-19-12 9:10AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR196 (Same As) 2012-03-20 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 50