HI HR151 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The San Francisco Mexican Consulate To Consider Establishment Of A Mexican Consulate In Hawaii.
Title
Mexican Consulate; Hawaii
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from INT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1721) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) The committees on INT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Brower, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by INT on Friday, 04-08-11 10:10AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Referred to INT, referral sheet 40 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-15 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR175 (Same As) 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to TIA.