HI HR148 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR148

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Education To Increase Access And Equity To Dual Credit Programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Education To Increase Access And Equity To Dual Credit Programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
2020-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
2020-03-11HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR169 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
HR148 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback