HI HR148 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Conduct A Feasibility And Cost Study Relating To The Construction Of A Boat Ramp In East Molokai Between Mile Markers Ten And Sixteen.
Title
DLNR; Small Boat Ramp in east Molokai
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1330) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha. |
2015-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Friday, 03-27-15 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR213 (Same As) 2015-04-07 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.