HI HR137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR137
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State Board On Geographic Names To Consult With Community Members Who Have Direct Traditional, Cultural, And Familial Ties To The District Of Puna To Establish Appropriate Names For The Fissure 8 Vent And Other Features Of The 2018 Eruption Of Kilauea Volcano.
Title
Urging The State Board On Geographic Names To Consult With Community Members Who Have Direct Traditional, Cultural, And Familial Ties To The District Of Puna To Establish Appropriate Names For The Fissure 8 Vent And Other Features Of The 2018 Eruption Of Kilauea Volcano.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1836), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen. |
2019-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR137 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR150 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33
HCR150 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=137&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR137_.HTM |